Skip to main content
Home
My area
Who we are
What we deliver
How we deliver
Contact us
Committees
Register
|
Login
Committees
Business Board
Committee Details
Description:
Active:
24 September 2018 - onwards
Membership:
Fixed
Substitutions:
Nominated
Meetings
Members
Other Information
Terms of Reference
Meetings
Display meetings in date range
From:
September 2024
September 2024
week
M
T
W
T
F
S
S
35
26
27
28
29
30
31
1
36
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
37
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
38
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
39
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
40
30
1
2
3
4
5
6
*
*
To:
September 2024
September 2024
week
M
T
W
T
F
S
S
35
26
27
28
29
30
31
1
36
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
37
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
38
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
39
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
40
30
1
2
3
4
5
6
*
*
*
Meeting Date - Start Time : End Time
Venue
Status
Calendar
1
2
3
4
5
Page 5 of 5, Displaying meetings 41 to 41 of 41 meetings found in selected date range
13 May 2024 - 14:30 : 17:00
West Hub, JJ Thomson Ave, Cambridge CB3 0US
Scheduled
Members
Committee Membership Filters
Members On:
September 2024
September 2024
week
M
T
W
T
F
S
S
35
26
27
28
29
30
31
1
36
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
37
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
38
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
39
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
40
30
1
2
3
4
5
6
*
*
Include Retired Members:
Party
Name
Role
Membership Dates
Labour
Mayor Dr Nik Johnson
Member
10/05/2021 - current
Labour
Councillor Anna Smith
Member
03/07/2023 - current
Vacancy
View Membership Report (as at selected date)
View Current Member's Contact Labels
Appointees
Appointee Name
Appointee Role
Appointee Membership Dates
1
2
Page 1 of 2, Displaying items 1 to 10 of 14 appointees/vacancies that match search criteria
Sam Bakri
Member
28/11/2023 - current
Katy Davies
Member
28/11/2023 - current
Emma Garfield
Member
07/03/2024 - current
Mike Herd
Non-Voting Co-opted Member
04/03/2021 - current
Charlotte Horobin
Member
28/11/2023 - current
Tim Jones
Member
07/03/2024 - current
Al Kingsley
Chairman of the Business Board
17/01/2020 - current
Araminta Ledger
Member
07/03/2024 - current
Nitin Patel
Vice-Chairman
17/01/2020 - current
Barnaby Perks
Member
28/11/2023 - current
Substitutes
Substitute Party
Substitute Name
Substitute Role
Substitute Membership Dates
Liberal Democrats
Councillor Bridget Smith
Substitute
27/07/2022 - current
Committee Clerk
Name:
Email Address:
Telephone:
Other Information
ToR - Business Board
(269Kb)
In This Section
Home
Committees
Inactive Committees
Forward Plan and Decision Notices
Forward Plan
Mayoral, Officer and Code of Conduct Decision Notices
Meetings
Members
Petitions
Public Documents
Search